Skanes, Allan Cameron (CPSO#: 62341)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
Arrhythmia Service
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3746
Fax: (519) 663-3782
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Cardiac Institute
Suite 302
256 Pall Mall Street
London ON  N6A 5P6
Canada
Phone: (519) 645-0146
Fax: (519) 645-1584
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allan Skanes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Skanes ( CPSO# 62341 )

Business Address:
London Cardiac Institute
256 Pall Mall Street
London ON  N6A 5P6
Phone Number: (519) 645-0146

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8300

Business Address:
University Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
Arrhythmia Service
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3746

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN CAMERON SKANES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKANES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993