Skeith, Leslie Anne (CPSO#: 92924)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital 501 Smyth Road Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Date Received: 18 Apr 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 30 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2014 to 19 Sep 2014
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 20 Sep 2014 to 17 Oct 2014
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018