Skladman, Irina (CPSO#: 83868)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:The Azerbaijan N.Narimanov Memorial Stat, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Family Practice
100 Main Street west
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone: 905-320-7526
Fax: (905) 637-1331
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CAMHS Haldimand & Norfolk
PO Box 5166
Townsend ON  N0A 1S0
Canada
Phone: 905-320-7526
Fax: 905-637-1331
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Correctional Service Canada
PO Box 1174, 443 Union Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2R8
Canada
Phone: 613-351-8879
Fax: 613-351-8342
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

1475 Upper Ottawa street
McMaster Family Health Team
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Canada
Phone: 905-575-1744
Fax: 905-637-1331
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I. Skladman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Skladman ( CPSO# 83868 )

Business Address:
100 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone Number: (905) 320-0752

Business Address:
Stone Church Family Health Centre
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 575-1300

Business Address:
101 Nanticoke Creek Parkway
PO Box 5166
Townsend ON  N0A 1S0
Phone Number: (905) 320-7526

Business Address:
443 Union Street
PO Box 1174
Kingston ON  K7L 2R8
Phone Number: (613) 351-8879

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRINA SKLADMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKLADMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2005 to 13 Feb 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 14 Feb 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 08 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 09 Apr 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009