Skolnik, Kate (CPSO#: 97341)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 19 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 19 Mar 2012 to 08 Apr 2012
Elective Trainee - Respirology

University of Toronto, 09 Feb 2015 to 08 Mar 2015
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 May 2017 to 02 Jun 2017
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jun 2017