Sladek, Robert Gaye (CPSO#: 55493)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McGill University
Suite 6214
740 Av du Dr. Penfield
Montreal QC  H3A 0G1
Phone: (514) 398-5458
Fax: (514) 398-1738

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 06 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT GAYE SLADEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLADEK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1990