Slataroff, Youssef Adel (CPSO#: 87329)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Apr 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Alexandria, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 336-3437 Ext. 19637
Fax: (905) 336-9632
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 21 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 21 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 26 Jun 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 26 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            (1 of 2) As from June 26, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition
            and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Yousef Adel
            Slataroff, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Slataroff
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. YOUSEF ADEL SLATAROFF
                                          ("Dr. Slataroff")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Slataroff, certificate of registration number 87329, am a member
                  of the College.  The College has received information regarding my
                  standard of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215046 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my psychiatry
                  practice. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Slataroff, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Slataroff, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for  twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (iii) Review at least ten (10) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting; 
                  
                        (iv)  For a minimum of the first three (3) months of Clinical
                              Supervision, the Clinical Supervisor shall observe me in
                              practice during a minimum of three (3) complete patient
                              encounters per month.  Following the three month period, upon
                              recommendation by the Clinical Supervisor(s) and subject to
                              the approval of the College,  the direct observation may
                              cease;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the observation and/or
                              chart reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              three months, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the report(s) of the
                        medical inspector dated September 25, 2016, and concerns that may
                        arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Slataroff, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Slataroff, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Slataroff, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Slataroff, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a
                        Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e)
                        and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time
                        as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        practise as a result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Slataroff, undertake that, approximately six (6) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
                        (5) above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Slataroff, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Slataroff, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Slataroff, undertake that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Slataroff, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (13)  I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Slataroff was the subject of a College Investigation into
                              whether he failed to maintain the standard of practice and/or
                              is incompetent in the practice of psychiatry.   As a result
                              of the investigation:
                  
                              Dr. Slataroff agrees to practise under the guidance of a
                              Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12)
                              months. 
                  
                              Dr. Slataroff's agrees that his practice will be reassessed
                              by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months
                              of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Slataroff, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Slataroff, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Slataroff, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment; and/or
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; 
                  
                  
            (2 of 2) As from April 21, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition
            and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Yousef Adel
            Slataroff, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Slataroff
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. YOUSEF ADEL SLATAROFF
                                          ("Dr. Slataroff")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                                                                                     
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Slataroff, certificate of registration number 87329, am a member
                  of the College.  The College has received information regarding my
                  standard of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7213639 (the "Investigation") into my practice at the
                  North Bay Regional Health Centre in 2011-2013. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Slataroff, understand and agree that I am bound by this
                  Undertaking from the date on which I sign it. 

            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Slataroff, undertake that, effective immediately, I will
                        restrict my practice to adult psychiatry (18 years and older) and,
                        except as expressly set out below; 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge that this restriction does not
                        preclude me from providing emergency psychiatric treatment to
                        children and adolescents (under the age of 18) who present to the
                        Emergency Room ("ER") while I am  on call in the ER, and to provide
                        only emergency treatment when called by the child and adolescent
                        inpatient unit while I am on call in the ER; 
                  
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Slataroff, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Slataroff, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and
                        not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice
                        Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the
                        purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Slataroff, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        and/or any person or institution that may have relevant
                        information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with
                        the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Slataroff, undertake to comply with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (11)  I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on
                  the College's Register that is available to the public during the time
                  period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Slataroff was the subject of a College investigation into his
                        practice at the North Bay Regional Health Centre in 2011-2013.   In
                        response to the investigation, Dr. Slataroff restricted his
                        practice to adult psychiatry (18 years or older).  Dr. Slataroff
                        may continue to provide emergency psychiatric treatment to patients
                        under the age of 18 while on call in the Emergency Room. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Slataroff, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 26, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Youssef Adel Slataroff to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 26, 2017:

Dr. Slataroff was the subject of a College Investigation into whether he failed to maintain the standard of practice and/or is incompetent in the practice of psychiatry. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Slataroff agrees to practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months.

Dr. Slataroff’s agrees that his practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.


Source: Member
Active Date: April 21, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Youssef Adel Slataroff to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 21, 2016:

Dr. Slataroff was the subject of a College investigation into his practice at the North Bay Regional Health Centre in 2011-2013. In response to the investigation, Dr. Slataroff restricted his practice to adult psychiatry (18 years or older). Dr. Slataroff may continue to provide emergency psychiatric treatment to patients under the age of 18 while on call in the Emergency Room.