Slattery, Margaret Anne Sarah (CPSO#: 26922)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1976
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 2015