Slavina, Anna (CPSO#: 87941)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Dec 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:St. Petersburg State Medical Academy, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Champagne Centre
Unit A4
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 222-6160
Fax: (416) 222-9604
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Feb 2013 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2009 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Anna Slavina may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine, only.