Sleiman, Nicholas (CPSO#: 111212)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 2018

Expiry Date:  29 Nov 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Jun 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wayne State University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
13278 Tecumseh Rd E
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Sleiman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sleiman ( CPSO# 111212)

Business Address:
Suite 101
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 979-5260

Business Address:
Suite 102
2425 Tecumseh Road
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone Number: (519) 944-1344

Business Address:
Suite 107
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 979-5260

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 May 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Nov 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jun 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Nicholas Sleiman may practise family medicine at 13278 Tecumseh Road
                  East in  Tecumseh,  Ontario,  while  under  supervision  coordinated by a
                  supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The  certificate  of  registration automatically expires on November  29,
                  2019. 

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of  any  concerns regarding Dr.
                        Sleiman's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude,  does not provide
                        the  required  reports  to the College by the due date  or  if  the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Sleiman's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the  assessment report, pertaining to the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Sleiman's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on June 18, 2018, and will expire on or before
                  November 29, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.