Sloan, Lisa Letitua (CPSO#: 76247)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5357 Fernbank Road
Kanata ON  K2S 1B6
Phone: (613) 831-7300
Fax: (613) 831-7377
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5501 abbott street
Ottawa ON  K2S 2C5
Canada
Phone: 613-836-0331
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Sloan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sloan ( CPSO# 76247 )

Business Address:
5357 Fernbank Road
Kanata ON  K2S 1B6
Phone Number: (613) 831-7300

Business Address:
5501 Abbott Street East
Stittsville ON  K2S 2C5
Phone Number: (613) 836-0331

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA LETITUA SLOAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLOAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003