Sloka, Jeffrey Scott (CPSO#: 92164)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Kaufman Building
Rm 554
835 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4277
Fax: (519) 749-4230
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Sloka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sloka ( CPSO# 92164 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Kaufman Building
5th Floor, Room 554
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4277

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 19 Sep 2017

Pending Hearings

Summary: (August 9, 2017) Allegations of Dr. Sloka’s professional misconduct were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Sloka engaged in sexual abuse of and/or disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct towards two patients during medical appointments. The conduct in issue includes having the patients undress completely or be inadequately draped for examination, touching of one patient, including her breasts, and Dr. Sloka’s communications with the patients during the appointments. (April 18, 2018) Further allegations of Dr. Sloka’s professional misconduct were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Sloka engaged in sexual abuse of and/or disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct towards a patient during a medical appointment. The conduct in issue includes touching the patient’s breasts, and moving draping/a gown, exposing the patient's breasts.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Hearing: May 13-17, May 27-31, June 10-14, June 24-28, 2019.

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 19 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 19, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Jeffrey Scott Sloka,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Sloka to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. JEFFREY SCOTT SLOKA
                                          ("Dr. Sloka")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Sloka, certificate of registration number 92164, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Sloka, acknowledge that the College has referred to the Discipline
                  Committee, allegations that I engaged in sexual abuse of a patient and
                  that I engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct.  

            (4)   I, Dr. Sloka, have read the Notice of Hearing dated August 8, 2017, which
                  sets out the allegations against me.  I am aware of the College's concern
                  about protecting the public and I understand the nature of the
                  allegations against me.

            (5)   I, Dr. Sloka, acknowledge that the College has accepted this Undertaking
                  in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at this time.

            (6)   I, Dr. Sloka, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the ICR
                  Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the
                  Code.

            (7)   I, Dr. Sloka, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until
                  the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the
                  Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Sloka, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (9)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sloka, undertake to cease to perform skin examinations on
                        any patient. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sloka, undertake that I shall not engage in any professional
                        encounters, in person or otherwise ("Professional Encounter(s)"),
                        with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the
                        Professional Encounter takes place in the continuous presence and
                        under the continuous observation of a monitor who is a regulated
                        health professional acceptable to the College (the "Practice
                        Monitor"), and unless the other requirements provided in this
                        Undertaking are fulfilled. For further clarity, I understand that I
                        must not be alone with any patient, for any length of time, during
                        any Professional Encounter, whether or not the parent or guardian
                        of the patient is also present.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sloka, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Practice
                        Monitor's undertaking (Grand River Hospital Urgent Neurology
                        Clinic, Grand River Hospital Stroke Clinic, Freeport Long-Term Care
                        and the Teaching Clinic at the Center for Family Medicine),
                        attached hereto as Appendix "A" and understand what is required of
                        the Practice Monitor including, but not limited to:
                  
                        1.    providing reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's
                              undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis; 
                  
                        2.    remaining present or at all times during all Professional
                              Encounters with all patients; 
                  
                        3.    carefully observing all of my Professional Encounters with
                              patients, including but not limited to physical and internal
                              examinations.  I further acknowledge my obligation to ensure
                              the Practice Monitor's view of all of my Professional
                              Encounters with patients, including physical and internal
                              examinations, is unobstructed at all times; 
                  
                        4.    refraining from performing any other functions, except those
                              required in the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as
                              Appendix "A",  while observing me in all my Professional
                              Encounters with patients; 
                  
                        5.    maintaining a log of all Professional Encounters with
                              patients in the form attached to this Undertaking as Appendix
                              "B" (the "Log");
                  
                        6.    initialing all corresponding entries in the records of
                              patients noted in the Log; and
                  
                        7.    submitting the original Log to the College on a monthly
                              basis.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Sloka, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Supervising
                        Practice Monitor's undertaking (Grand River and St. Mary's In
                        Patient Care On Call Services), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and
                        understand what is required of the Practice Monitor including, but
                        not limited to:
                  
                        1.    providing reports (as described in the Supervising Practice
                              Monitor's undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly
                              basis; 
                  
                        2.    remaining present, or ensuring a ward nurse remains present,
                              at all times during all Professional Encounters with all
                              patients; 
                  
                        3.    carefully observing, or ensuring a ward nurse observes, all
                              of my Professional Encounters with patients, including but
                              not limited to physical and internal examinations.  I further
                              acknowledge my obligation to ensure the Practice Monitor's or
                              ward nurse's view of all of my Professional Encounters with
                              patients, including physical and internal examinations, is
                              unobstructed at all times; 
                  
                        4.    refraining from performing any other functions, or ensuring
                              the ward nurse so refrains, except those required in the
                              Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as Appendix "A",
                              while observing me in all my Professional Encounters with
                              patients; 
                  
                        5.    maintaining a log of all Professional Encounters with
                              patients in the form attached to this Undertaking as Appendix
                              "B" (the "Log");
                  
                        6.    initialing, or insuring the ward nurse initials, all
                              corresponding entries in the records of patients noted in the
                              Log; and
                  
                        7.    submitting the original Log to the College on a monthly
                              basis.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Sloka, undertake to maintain my own copy of the Log at all
                        times, and to make it available to the College upon request. 
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Sloka, acknowledge that I have advised the College of each and
                  every location that I practise or have privileges including, but not
                  limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                  (collectively my "Practice Location(s)").  Going forward, I further
                  undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations at
                  least (7) days prior commencing practice at that location, and
                  acknowledge that the requirements in this Undertaking will apply to any
                  new Practice Location. 

            (11)  Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sloka, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall post a
                        sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms
                        where I treat patients at the Grand River Hospital Urgent Neurology
                        Clinic, the Grand River Hospital Stroke Clinic, the Freeport Long
                        Term, Care and the Teaching Clinic at the Centre for Family
                        Medicine, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set
                        out in Appendix "C" that states: "Dr. Sloka must not  have
                        professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients, of
                        any age, unless in the continuous presence and under the continuous
                        observation of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of
                        Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.  Dr. Sloka must not be alone
                        during any professional encounter with any patient. Further
                        information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sloka, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in any
                        language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (11)(a), in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and
                        consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "D."
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sloka, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (11)(b), to the College within thirty (30)
                        days of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Sloka, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
                        will notify the College prior to providing any such services.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Sloka, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (11)(b) prior to providing
                        services in the language(s) described in section (11)(d).
                  
            (12)  Notifying Patients 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sloka, undertake to provide each patient with whom I have a
                        Professional Encounter with in In-Patient Care at Grand River
                        Hospital and in In-Patient Care at St. Mary's Hospital with a copy
                        of the sign noted above in Appendix "C' and explain prior to the
                        Professional Encounter, the details of the restriction described in
                        section (9)(b), above.  I undertake to ensure the patient (or their
                        next of kin if the patient is incapable), initials the sign and
                        that a copy of the initialed sign is maintained in the patient
                        chart. 
                  
                  (b)   With respect to patients with whom I have appointments that are
                        scheduled at least seven (7) days in advance at any Practice
                        Location, I, Dr. Sloka, undertake to ensure that each patient is
                        directly notified, within seven (7) days after the appointment is
                        scheduled, of the details of the restriction described in section
                        (9)(b), above.
                  
            (13)  I, Dr. Sloka, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Sloka, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any chief(s) of staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities,
                  at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (15)  I, Dr. Sloka, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may
                  result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee.

            (16)  I, Dr. Sloka, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent legal counsel
                  in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to
                  do so.

            (17)  I, Dr. Sloka, acknowledge that in the event of an appeal of any Order of
                  the Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (18)  I, Dr. Sloka, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Sloka, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (20)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sloka, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sloka, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (20)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Sloka is the subject of a referral to the Discipline
                              Committee into allegations of professional misconduct. As a
                              result of the referral:
                  
                              Dr. Sloka shall not perform skin examinations on any patient. 
                  
                              Dr. Sloka must not engage in any professional encounters, in
                              person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any
                              jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the
                              continuous presence of a monitor who is a regulated health
                              professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other
                              requirements provided in Dr. Sloka's Undertaking with the
                              College are fulfilled.  For further clarity, Dr. Sloka must
                              not be alone with any patient during any professional
                              encounter.
                  
                              Dr. Sloka shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination
                              rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a
                              clearly visible and secure location, that states: "Dr. Sloka
                              must not have professional encounters, in person or
                              otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in the continuous
                              presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of
                              Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.  Dr. Sloka must not be
                              alone with any patient during any professional encounter.
                              Further information may be found on the College website at
                              www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
            C.    CONSENT

            (21)  I, Dr. Sloka, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (22)  I, Dr. Sloka, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "E".

            (23)  I, Dr. Sloka, consent to submit and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient records by the College
                  and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor
                  my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (24)  I, Dr. Sloka, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Practice Monitors and all ward nurses:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (25)  I, Dr. Sloka, give my irrevocable consent to all Practice Monitors and
                  all ward nurses to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Practice Monitor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" or "B"; and/or
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking.
                  
            (26)  I, Dr. Sloka, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (27)  I, Dr. Sloka, give my irrevocable consent to all Chief(s) of Staff to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to
                  this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 19, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Jeffrey Scott Sloka to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 19, 2017:

Dr. Sloka is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations of professional misconduct. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Sloka shall not perform skin examinations on any patient.

Dr. Sloka must not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the continuous presence of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Sloka’s Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Sloka must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter.

Dr. Sloka shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Sloka must not have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in the continuous presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Sloka must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.