Slowey, Gabriel Joseph (CPSO#: 23893)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018