Sly, Lloyd Edward (CPSO#: 32538)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
76 Stuart St, Kingston, Ontario
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 2752
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Providence Care Hospital
752 King St West
Kingston, Ontario
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Canada
Phone: 613 544 4900
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
166 Brock St, Kingston, Ontario
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3021
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L.E. Sly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sly ( CPSO# 32538 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LLOYD EDWARD SLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1981