Small, Elizabeth Ann (CPSO#: 90518)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
820 Sherbrook Street
Winnipeg, Manitoba R3A 1R9
winnipeg MB  R3A 1R9
Phone: (204) 787 1328

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia
Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 03 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANN SMALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2014