Smallfield, Audra Lynn (CPSO#: 95259)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Audra Smallfield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Smallfield ( CPSO# 95259 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AUDRA LYNN SMALLFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMALLFIELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016