Smallwood, Jennifer Lee (CPSO#: 93490)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 271-2120
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LEE SMALLWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMALLWOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 23 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2017