Smart, Victoria Marie Sinclair (CPSO#: 92225)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Div Medical Oncology
Floor 5
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1366 Yonge Street
Suite 410
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Canada
Phone: 9059642220
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Unit 23 Suite 210
1077 North Service Rd
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1A6
Canada
Phone: (905) 273-9009
Fax: 9052736409
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Unit 23 Suite 210
1077 North Service Rd
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1A6
Canada
Phone: (905) 273-9009
Fax: (905) 273-6409
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTORIA MARIE SINCLAIR SMART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 01 Dec 2009
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2011