Smilovici, Brian (CPSO#: 97149)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 160 Stillview Avenue Pointe-Claire, QC H9R 2Y2
Date Received: 20 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jan 2012 to 12 Feb 2012
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015