Smith, Andrew Augustine Navin (CPSO#: 91141)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara on the Lake
Family Health Network
PO Box 10
1882 Niagara Stone Road
Virgil ON  L0S 1T0
Phone: (905) 468-3275
Fax: (905) 468-7960
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew A. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Smith ( CPSO# 91141 )

Business Address:
Niagara on the Lake
Family Health Team
PO Box 10
1882 Niagara Stone Road
Virgil ON  L0S 1T0
Phone Number: (905) 468-3275

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW AUGUSTINE NAVIN SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011