Smith, Andrew James Kendric (CPSO#: 92373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Nov 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Nov 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
Addiction Medicine Service
100 Stokes Street
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 595-6019
Fax: (416) 595-6821
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
Wasser Pain Management Centre
20th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-5997
Fax: (416) 586-5067
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pain Medicine Effective: 07 Mar 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Andrew  James  Kendric  Smith  may practise medicine independently in pain
            medicine and addiction medicine, only.