Smith, Chris Gerard (CPSO#: 90212)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 08 Feb 2009 to 08 Mar 2009
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2012