Smith, Crystal Anne (CPSO#: 71747)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 472-3374
Fax: (905) 472-3116
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Working Condition Program
c/o Holland Orthopedic Centre
Rm 415 - 43 Wellesley St E
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Canada
Phone: (416) 967-8699
Fax: (416) 967-8579
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Crystal A. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Smith ( CPSO# 71747 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (905) 472-3374

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
Working Conditions Program
Holland Orthopedic Centre
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone Number: (416) 967-8699

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRYSTAL ANNE SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2006