Smith, David Richard (CPSO#: 92538)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Columbia University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Orthopaedic Pain Institute
Suite 500
797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone: (613) 344-1202
Fax: (613) 344-1203
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David R. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Feb 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Mar 2016