Smith, Derek Brian (CPSO#: 90754)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 289-0185
Fax: 416-289-0187
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3000 Lawrence Ave. E., Building B
Suite 2202
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 431-5885
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

181 Bay St., Suite 3000
Toronto ON  M5J2T3
Canada
Phone: 4165076600
Fax: 4165076610
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3050 Lawrence Ave. E.
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derek Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Smith ( CPSO# 90754 )

Business Address:
206 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 289-0185

Business Address:
Room 2202
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Phone Number: (416) 431-5885

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
3000-181 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Phone Number: (416) 507-6600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 06 Aug 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK BRIAN SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 06 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 07 Aug 2011 to 06 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 07 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 07 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 06 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2014