Smith, Emma Kathleen (CPSO#: 95136)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1060 Burnham Street
Suite 5
Cobourg ON  K9A 5V9
Phone: (905) 373-8333
Fax: (905) 373-9333
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Emma Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Smith ( CPSO# 95136 )

Business Address:
Cobourg Medical Centre
1060 Burnham Street
Suite 5
Cobourg ON  K9A 5V9
Phone Number: (905) 373-8333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMMA KATHLEEN SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013