Smith, Heather Elizabeth (CPSO#: 95116)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Parry Sound Health Centre
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone: (705) 746-9321
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Smith ( CPSO# 95116 )

Business Address:
West Parry Sound Health Centre
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER ELIZABETH SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2013