Smith, Jonathan Giles (CPSO#: 80973)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
1 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone: (705) 445-2311
Fax: (705) 445-2313
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Canada
Phone: 705 445-2550
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fraser and Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Smith ( CPSO# 80973 )
Dr. M. Fraser ( CPSO# 82690 )

Business Address:
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Business Address:
Suite 206
1 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN GILES SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006