Smith, Kevin Christopher (CPSO#: 53074)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 1987

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201-6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Phone: (905) 356-7744
Fax: (905) 356-8362
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 16 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN CHRISTOPHER SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1987

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: May 23, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Current Bail Conditions:

Effective December 4, 2014, the College By-laws require members to report to the College any currently existing conditions of release (“bail conditions”) following a charge for a criminal or provincial offence or subsequent to a finding of guilt and pending appeal. The following are conditions of release made against this member:

[November 22, 2017]

(i) Abstain from communicating directly or indirectly with XX, YY, and ZZ or from going to within 50 metres of Firemans Park, 2401 Dorchester Road, Niagara Falls.


Source: Other
Active Date: May 23, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Charges

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College:

(1) on or about November 22, 2017 at the City of Niagara Falls did wilfully cause unnecessary suffering to an animal, namely a mixed breed Rottweiler dog by spraying the dog in the face with dog repellant spray, contrary to Section 445.1(2) of the Criminal code of Canada;

(2) on or about November 22, 2017 at the city of Niagara Falls did, in committing an assault on XX, use a weapon, namely dog repellant spray, contrary to Section 267(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada; and

(3) on or about November 22, 2017 at the City of Niagara Falls did possess a weapon, namely dog repellant spray, for a purpose dangerous to the public peace, contrary to Section 88(2) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charges: November 23, 2017
Place of charges: Niagara Falls, ON
Niagara Regional Police Service


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 4, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective December 4, 2018, Dr. Kevin Christopher Smith has completed all components of his SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)