Smith, Kevin Gregory (CPSO#: 66319)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin G. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 6 2018


Corporation Name: Adams Gilmour Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 25659 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. K. Smith ( CPSO# 66319 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Medical Records Location

Address: Medical Associates of Port Perry 462 Paxton St Port Perry ON L9L 1L9
Date Received: 02 Aug 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN GREGORY SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2017