Smith, Kirsten Leigh (CPSO#: 78752)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 315
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 494-0007
Fax: (416) 494-8758
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kirsten L. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Smith ( CPSO# 78752 )

Business Address:
Suite 315
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 494-0007

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRSTEN LEIGH SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 07 Jan 2003 to 02 Feb 2003
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 03 Feb 2003 to 28 Feb 2003
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2003 to 28 Mar 2003
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Mar 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2004