Smith, Patricia Anne (CPSO#: 71952)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Obstetrics
and Gynaecology
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
Room 4D-11 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73476
Fax: (905) 527-2675
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patricia Anne Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Smith ( CPSO# 71952 )

Business Address:
Department of Obstetrics
and Gynaecology
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
Room 4D-11 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 07 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA ANNE SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 29 Jan 1999
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jan 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2000