Smith, Sean Cameron (CPSO#: 93109)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
343 Preston Street
Ottawa ON  K1S 1N4
Phone: (613) 729-1616
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sean C. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Smith ( CPSO# 93109 )

Business Address:
200 - 343 Preston Street
Ottawa ON  K1S 1N4
Phone Number: (613) 729-1616

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 7J4
Phone Number: (613) 257-2200

Business Address:
705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN CAMERON SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2016