Smith, Stephanie Wrenn (CPSO#: 82295)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 218
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 2764
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 03 Apr 2005 to 26 May 2005
Elective Trainee - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 May 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2005