Smoragiewicz, Martin (CPSO#: 94955)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's Cancer Research Institute
Cancer Clinical Trials Division
10 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-6430
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN SMORAGIEWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMORAGIEWICZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2011 to 08 May 2011
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2017