Smrke, Alannah Marie (CPSO#: 103260)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 2018

Expiry Date:  23 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Elective as of 27 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2000
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALANNAH MARIE SMRKE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SMRKE is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. SMRKE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SMRKE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SMRKE shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times: when Dr. SMRKE is no longer enrolled in the postgraduate medical education program for which the certificate is issued; when Dr. SMRKE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada); or when fifteen weeks have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 23 Sep 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2018 to 23 Sep 2018
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2018