Smyth, Karl Richard (CPSO#: 77163)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Nov 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Nov 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4054
Fax: (613) 761-4476
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Smyth and Condon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Condon ( CPSO# 77162 )
Dr. K. Smyth ( CPSO# 77163 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 789-5555

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARL RICHARD SMYTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMYTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2001