Snaith, Rosemary Jane (CPSO#: 96217)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Glasgow, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Aug 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Aug 2011 to 15 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 2012