Snell, Laura Jean (CPSO#: 79096)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Plastic Surgery
Suite M1 519A
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6069
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Snell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Snell ( CPSO# 79096 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite M1 - 519A
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 454-9252

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA JEAN SNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2010