So, Anthony Chi Long (CPSO#: 96092)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
1E 452
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 416 603 5869
Fax: 416 603 4348
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 06 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY CHI LONG SO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Oct 2017
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2016