So, Boris (CPSO#: 81569)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Patient Networks
157 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5C 1X7
Phone: (416) 362-8822
Fax: (416) 362-8877
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boris So Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. So ( CPSO# 81569 )

Business Address:
Patient Networks
157 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5C 1X7
Phone Number: (416) 362-8822

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BORIS SO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2006