Soares, Claudio De Novaes (CPSO#: 82250)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 25 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Sao Paulo, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Adult Psychiatry Division
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: 613-549-6666 Ext. 7839
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Soares Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 30 2012

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 Apr 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAUDIO DE NOVAES SOARES may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF PSYCHIATRY, QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY in which Dr. SOARES holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. SOARES may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. SOARES no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. SOARES no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. SOARES no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is 30 Jun 2019.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 26 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019