Sobtchouk, Anatoli Nesterovich (CPSO#: 77346)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Military Medical Academy, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 14 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Mar 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018