Sochocka, Elzbieta Krystyna (CPSO#: 83570)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Jul 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish, Russian

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
330 Bronte St South
Unit 120
Milton ON  L9T 7X1
Phone: (905) 693-9961
Fax: (905) 693-0982
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Sochocka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sochocka ( CPSO# 83570 )

Business Address:
330 Bronte Street South
Unit 120
Milton ON  L9T 7X1
Phone Number: (905) 693-0982

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Oct 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 27 Oct 2006
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Nov 2006
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 06 Jan 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 06 Jan 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  January  6,  2016,  the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of  registration  held  by  Dr. Elzbieta Krystyna
            Sochocka, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given  by  Dr. Sochocka
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  As of January 6, 2016, Dr. Sochocka's clinical practice will be monitored
                  by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  After the  period of
                  Clinical Supervision, Dr. Sochocka's practice will be reassessed  by  the
                  College.
                  
                  
                  
                  
            As  from  September 29, 2006, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation  on  the  certificate  of registration held by Dr. Elzbieta Krystyna
            Sochocka by order of the Registration  Committee  of  the College of Physicians
            and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Elzbieta Krystyna Sochocka may practise only in the areas of medicine
                  in which Dr. Sochocka is educated and experienced.