Sockalingam, Sanjeev (CPSO#: 79231)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2067-33 Russell St
Toronto ON  M5S 2S1
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32178
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4 East - 399 Bathurst Ave
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 6145
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sockalingam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sockalingam ( CPSO# 79231 )

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
2067 - 33 Russell Street
Toronto ON  M5S 2S1
Phone Number: (416) 534-8501

Business Address:
4 East
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJEEV SOCKALINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOCKALINGAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008