Soeder, Samantha Paige (CPSO#: 88515)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1150 Pontiac Drive
Suite #4
Sarnia ON  N7S 3A7
Phone: (519) 339-8949
Fax: (519) 339-9022
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Canada
Phone: 519-464-4400
Fax: 519-464-4407
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samantha Soeder Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Soeder ( CPSO# 88515 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4500

Business Address:
1150 Pontiac Drive
Suite #4
Sarnia ON  N7S 3A7
Phone Number: (519) 339-8949

Business Address:
London Road Diagnostic Clinic
481 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone Number: (519) 332-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMANTHA PAIGE SOEDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOEDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 08 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2010