Sofronova, Elionora Petrovna (CPSO#: 83980)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian, Russian

Education:N.Testemitanu State Medical and Pharma, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 408
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2J 3Z4
Phone: (519) 744-2592
Fax: (519) 744-1197
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sofronova Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sofronova ( CPSO# 83980 )

Business Address:
408 - 430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2J 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 744-2592

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jan 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIONORA PETROVNA SOFRONOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOFRONOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2006 to 05 Apr 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 06 Apr 2006 to 16 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2007 to 16 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2008