Soghrati, Kamyar (CPSO#: 76367)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
409 - 2300 Eglinton Ave
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 569-1700
Fax: (905) 997-2002
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

390 Steeles Avenue west
suite 208
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Canada
Phone: 905-709-9696
Fax: 905-709-9764
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kamyar Soghrati Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Soghrati ( CPSO# 76367 )

Business Address:
Suite 409
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 569-1700

Business Address:
Suite 208
390 Steeles Avenue West
Toronto ON  L4J 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 709-9696

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 12 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAMYAR SOGHRATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOGHRATI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005