Sohal, Jasdeep Singh (CPSO#: 94045)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Pune, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tillsonburg Medical Centre
200 - Broadway St
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 5A7
Phone: 519 842 4231
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jasdeep Sohal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sohal ( CPSO# 94045 )

Business Address:
200 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 5A7
Phone Number: (519) 842-4231

Business Address:
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASDEEP SINGH SOHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOHAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 29 Dec 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Dec 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 07 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012