Sokoloff, Dina Rose (CPSO#: 63549)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
885 Meadowlands Drive
Suite 402
Ottawa ON  K2C 3N2
Phone: (613) 224-6339
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DINA ROSE SOKOLOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOKOLOFF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992