Solh, Ziad (CPSO#: 84398)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room D1-236
800 Commissioners Rd E, PO Box 5010
Victoria Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 519 685 8500 Ext. 55305
Fax: 519 685 8471
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ziad Solh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Solh ( CPSO# 84398 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Haematology/Oncology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZIAD SOLH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2012